Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - First Degree Murder - Sentencing (Geraldine's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the court to impose lifetime supervision for a person sentenced to imprisonment for life for first degree murder; requiring the lifetime supervision to include at least 5 years of supervised probation, electronic monitoring for life following release, and specified conditions as determined by the court; authorizing a person to file a petition for discharge from lifetime supervision and requiring a court to hear and adjudicate the petition; prohibiting more than one petition for discharge in 1 year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 2-201, 2-203, 2-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM