Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Conway, Waugh, Kagan, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Robinson, Salling, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education to provide age-appropriate instruction on the meaning of "consent," which is defined as the unambiguous and voluntary agreement between all participants in each physical act within the course of interpersonal relationships, including respect for personal boundaries; and requiring a county board to provide age-appropriate instruction on the meaning of "consent" as part of the Family Life and Human Sexuality curriculum beginning in the 2018-1019 school year.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604835/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-21)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {604835/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 32
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Ways and Means 33
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (118-21) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Text - Chapter - Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM