Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain health care practitioners to establish a practitioner-patient relationship through certain telehealth interactions under certain circumstances; requiring a health care practitioner providing telehealth services to be held to the same standards of practice that are applicable to in-person settings; requiring a health care practitioner to perform a clinical evaluation appropriate for the condition the patient presents before providing certain treatment or issuing a prescription through telehealth; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0448
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 15
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1001 through 1-1006 )
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 4:12 PM