Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing all county boards of education, rather than only certain county boards of education, to waive the requirement that a participating employer reimburse the county for the cost of the premium for workers' compensation coverage provided to students placed in unpaid work-based learning experiences or pay a certain fee.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0814
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 28
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 28
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Referred Economic Matters 31
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Text - Chapter - Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM