Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Unauthorized Software
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Benson, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the creation of or unauthorized introduction into a computer, computer system, or computer network of unauthorized software designed to restrict access or use by an authorized user for the purpose of extorting money, property, or anything of value from another; establishing that a violation is a felony with up to 10 years imprisonment and up to a $10,000 fine; providing that a person who has suffered a specified injury because of a specified violation may bring a civil action in a specified court; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0340
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Extortion - Unauthorized Software
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Extortion - Unauthorized Software
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM