Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination – Grant Funding and Task Force
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, Klausmeier, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Rosapepe, Washington, Beidle, and Kelley
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include $100,000 in the annual budget beginning in fiscal year 2021 for the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund; establishing the Task Force on Maryland Maternal and Child Health; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations, including on programs that the Maryland Medical Assistance Program should implement; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0520
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {907071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on Maryland Maternal and Child Health
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {546688/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {907071/1 Adopted 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Text - Third - Task Force on Maryland Maternal and Child Health
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 39
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations 40
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {546688/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination – Grant Funding and Task Force
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Text - Chapter - Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination – Grant Funding and Task Force
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM