Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Food Allergy Awareness
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin and Shank
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a restaurant, beginning March 1, 2015, to request that a customer inform the employee taking the customer's food order of any known food allergies before ordering; authorizing a county to require a restaurant, beginning March 1, 2015, to have on the premises at specified times an employee who has completed and passed a specified food allergen awareness training course and is available to discuss meal options with customers who have food allergies; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207973/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {246388/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-36)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senators Feldman, Glassman, and Pugh
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {207973/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments {246388/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-36) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senators Feldman, Glassman, and Pugh 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-330.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM