Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail Concessions
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Conway, Gladden, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Aviation Administration to enter into a specified type of lease with a concessions developer to provide food service and retail operations at the BWI Thurgood Marshall Airport; requiring the Administration to enter into specified leases if the Administration terminates a lease with a concessions developer prior to the end of the lease; requiring that on or before October 1, 2017, the Administration exercise a specified option to terminate a specified lease; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0228
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM