Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Residential Environment of Seniors in Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Currie, and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Residential Environment of Seniors in Baltimore City; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study certain issues and make certain recommendations related to the improvement of the residential environment of seniors living in Baltimore City; requiring the Task Force to make a certain report to certain persons on or before December 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Task Force to Study the Residential Environment of Seniors in Baltimore City
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM