Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Robey, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting owners, employees, and operators of tanning facilities from allowing minors to use tanning devices.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0310
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0488 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM