Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsored by
Senators West, Elfreth, and Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring local boards of elections to establish separate precincts in continuing care retirement communities of 200 or more persons who are at least 60 years of age to specifically serve at least the residents of those retirement communities if a continuing care retirement community requests a polling place be established on the premises; requiring continuing care retirement community providers to provide certain facilities and services to the local board if a certain polling place is established on the premises; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Polling Places at Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM