Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Dentists Who Dispense Antibiotics - Exclusion From Maryland Pharmacy Act
Sponsored by
Senator Dyson
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the Maryland Pharmacy Act does not prohibit, under specified circumstances, a licensed dentist from dispensing a full course of treatment of antibiotics to a patient for infection control.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0303
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444532/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {444532/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM