Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study certain matters, collect certain data, and make certain recommendations; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services Oversight
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Reassigned to Finance 16
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM