Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Gladden, Currie, Ferguson, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that specified law enforcement officers record specified information pertaining to traffic stops; requiring specified law enforcement agencies to report specified information to the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center; requiring the Police Training Commission to develop a specified format and guidelines and a standardized format for the reporting of specified data; requiring the Police Training Commission to develop a specified model policy; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0339
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {558376/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {558376/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-17)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {558376/1 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Favorable with Amendments {558376/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 50
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (121-17) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   25-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM