Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Middleton, Raskin, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Benson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified report on the Waiting List Equity Fund to include information regarding individuals in the crisis resolution category of the waiting list for developmental disabilities services; establishing mandated appropriations for developmental disabilities community services; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that an individual who, after receiving services provided with specified funds, continue to receive uninterrupted developmental disabilities services in accordance with the individual's needs; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1499
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {777576/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-4)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {777576/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-4) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-205, 7-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM