Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts
Sponsored by
Senator Brochin
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "mechanical repair contract"; authorizing an agent and a registered obligor under a mechanical repair contract to offer, sell, or negotiate a mechanical repair contract; establishing that an obligor or a vehicle dealer is liable for the actions of its agent under specified circumstances; requiring an obligor or a licensed vehicle dealer that uses an agent to sell a mechanical repair contract to maintain a specified list and, on request, make the list available to the Insurance Commissioner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0675
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {748079/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903092/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {748079/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {903092/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-311.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM