Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Resources and Data Collection
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Currie, and Madaleno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to collaborate with certain State entities to identify all State resources available to small businesses and develop a plan to coordinate resources with the Office; requiring the Office to convene a workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding the collection of data by State agencies that may be used to assist small businesses in accessing State resources and bidding on State contracts; requiring a certain report from the Office by December 1, 2018; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {844039/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Coordination of Small Business Resources
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {844039/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Resources and Data Collection
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Text - Chapter - Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Resources and Data Collection
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM