Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Morticians and Funeral Directors - Pre-Need Contracts
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Benson, Reilly, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified disclosure statements in pre-need contracts inform a buyer whether the contract is a guaranteed contract, guaranteed in part contract, or nonguaranteed contract; providing that if specified disclosures are made, pre-need contracts may be guaranteed contracts, guaranteed in part contracts, or nonguaranteed contracts and may include cash advance items or goods and services that are not guaranteed; providing that a pre-need escrow or trust account may not be deemed an asset of specified licensees; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0593
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544433/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544433/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Getty) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544433/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416587/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {544433/1 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted 42
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {544433/1 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Getty) Adopted 43
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {544433/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {416587/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM