Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Workgroup to Study Data Collection to Assist Small Businesses
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Benson, Currie, Kelley, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to convene a certain workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding the collection of data by State agencies that may be used to assist small businesses in accessing State resources and bidding on State contracts; requiring the workgroup to focus on the types of data that may be collected by certain State agencies; requiring the workgroup to include certain representatives and business owners; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Workgroup to Study Data Collection to Assist Small Businesses
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM