Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Toll Transportation Facilities Project - Annual Pass - Study
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Manno, Norman, Rosapepe, Serafini, Simonaire, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to study the feasibility of offering motorists, for each transportation facilities project, an option to pay a flat fee for an annual pass to use the toll transportation facilities project; requiring the study to include a cost-benefit analysis covering the potential for benefit to consumers, the programming and other costs associated with implementation of the annual pass option, and the impact on specified toll revenues; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {837777/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {837777/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 32
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM