Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Curriculum - Holocaust and Genocide Unit (Lessons of the Holocaust and Genocide Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Patterson, Peters, Smith, Waldstreicher, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Declaring the intent of the General Assembly regarding instruction on the Holocaust and genocide to Maryland students to ensure these tragedies are not forgotten and to gain an understanding of ways to prevent such events in the future; requiring public middle schools and high schools and certain nonpublic middle schools and high schools to include in the curriculum a unit of instruction on the Holocaust and genocide that is consistent with certain guidelines; requiring the State Board to develop certain guidelines by January 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Curriculum - Holocaust and Genocide Unit (Lessons of the Holocaust and Genocide Act)
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM