Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Low Intensity Support Services - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Lowering the funding cap on low intensity support services provided to specified individuals each fiscal year through the Low Intensity Support Services Program in the Developmental Disabilities Administration.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0556
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {327170/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {327170/1 Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 28
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 57
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM