Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Raskin, Guzzone, Kagan, Astle, Currie, Feldman, Gladden, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to request aid in dying by making specified requests; prohibiting another individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of an individual; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet specified requirements; establishing requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a specified form; requiring an attending physician who receives a written request for aid in dying to make a specified determination; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0404
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
(   3-102, 3-103 )
(   5-6A-01 through 5-6A-16 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page