Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an Education Savings Account program in the State; stating the purpose of the program; establishing the requirements for participation in the program; requiring a certain deposit into the account of certain students; establishing a process for calculating and depositing a certain amount; limiting the use of certain funds to certain educational purposes; establishing the autonomy of a participating private school; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1552
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.11-101 through 9.11-107 )
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 4:14 PM