Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Restricted Firearm Ammunition - Prohibition on Possession and Use
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Raskin, Garagiola, Manno, Montgomery, and Ramirez
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making it a misdemeanor to possess or use specified firearm ammunition during and in relation to the commission of a crime; and establishing penalties.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0490
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 48
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Judiciary 52
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM