Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Beer Festival Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding a holder of a Class 8 farm brewery license to the list of applicants eligible for a beer festival license in Garrett County; authorizing a holder of a beer festival license in Garrett County to display and sell beer that is manufactured and processed in any state and distributed in Maryland when the application for the beer festival license is filed.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373694/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed 39
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {373694/1 Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Passed Enrolled 59
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM