Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Conway, DeGrange, Kagan, Reilly, Robinson, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified improvements to specified real property that is adjacent to or abuts specified religious property in charter or code home rule counties may be authorized only if specified conditions are met, including provision for specified buffers, improvements, approvals, covenants, and financial responsibilities; and applying the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Counties - Historic Preservation - Development Limitation
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301, 10-325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM