Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reestablishing the Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority, which was originally established by Chapter 789 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2018; providing for the composition, chair, staffing, and purpose of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to consult with certain entities and study and make recommendations on certain matters; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0735
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Appropriations 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Text - Chapter - Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page