Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Norman, Brochin, Cassilly, Gladden, Hough, Lee, Muse, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt regulations requiring that classroom instruction for the driver education program include instruction on what to do when stopped by a police officer.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0967
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 43
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM