Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the General Assembly to provide by suitable enactment a process to allow a qualified individual to register and vote at a polling place on election day or on a day designated for voting before election day; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0345
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0417 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {705366/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {703329/1 (Delegate A. Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {113829/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-82)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-49)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 38
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed 39
Text - Third - Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling Place
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 41
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Ways and Means 43
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {705366/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {703329/1 (Delegate A. Washington) Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {113829/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-82) 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (88-49) 65
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 63A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM