Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Somerset County to adopt an emergency burning ban; prohibiting a person from starting or allowing any open air burning during an emergency burning ban, subject to specified exceptions; authorizing the County Commissioners, by resolution, to set a fine for a violation of an emergency burning ban; and authorizing the Sheriff and the Sheriff's deputies to assess a fine against any person believed to be in violation of an emergency burning ban.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0465
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284730/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {284730/1 Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 37
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM