Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Number Systems Board - 9-1-1 Trust Fund - Planning Costs
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Emergency Number Systems Board to use the 9-1-1 Trust Fund to pay for specified costs of establishing specified planning guidelines for enhanced 9-1-1 system plans; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM