Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, Simonaire, Washington, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Critical Medical Needs Program in the Office of Home Energy Programs of the Family Investment Administration within the Department of Human Services in recognition of the challenges with energy bills faced by individuals with critical medical needs and limited financial resources; requiring the Office to work with electric and gas companies to implement, for critically medically vulnerable individuals, a hold or extension of service for those losing service and restoration where service has been terminated; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {837578/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {837578/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Returned Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Text - Chapter - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
(   5-5A-01, 5-5A-02, 5-5A-06, 5-5A-07, 5-5A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page