Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to update, improve, and develop certain screening tools, submit certain screening tools to the Maryland Department of Health, study certain actions and best practices, develop a certain template, and make and develop certain recommendations; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by October 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0783
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2021
Legislative Date
1/24/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Senate 1/24/2021 1/24/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 4:09 PM
Click to return on the top page