Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the City of Annapolis to participate in the Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact, the purpose of which is to provide for mutual assistance between the jurisdictions in managing an emergency.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0383
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 33
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-801, 14-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM