Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, King, Lee, Middleton, Peters, Smith, Jennings, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems to conduct a study regarding the most beneficial locations for automated external defibrillators, the costs associated with installation of and training on the specified defibrillators and to summarize the immunity from liability provisions in State law related to use of the defibrillators; requiring the Institute to report its findings and recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0522
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0434 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {237174/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {516184/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Food Service Facilities - Automated External Defibrillator Program (The Joe Sheya Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {237174/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Food Service Facilities - Automated External Defibrillator Program (The Joe Sheya Act)
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (39-8) 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {516184/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Text - Chapter - Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-330.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM