Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Madaleno, Robinson, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, and Waugh
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "eligible individual" by requiring that an elderly individual must live in the same county, rather than the same dwelling, for at least 25 years to be eligible for a certain statewide optional property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax; and applying the Act to tax years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0601 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - Eligibility
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable Adopted 25
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - Eligibility
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 28
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM