Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act; authorizing specified fiduciaries to access specified digital assets under specified circumstances; authorizing a fiduciary to take specified actions concerning an asset under specified circumstances; providing that, for specified purposes, a fiduciary has the lawful consent of an account holder for the custodian to divulge the content of an electronic communication to the fiduciary and is, for the purpose of specified computer-related laws, an authorized user; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0531
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-601 through 15-613, 17-202, 17-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM