Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Maryland Design Excellence Commission
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Feldman, Lee, Middleton, Raskin, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Design Excellence Commission; establishing that the Commission is in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation; requiring the Commission to study, develop specified plans and programs, and establish specified events regarding design excellence initiatives; requiring the Commission to report its findings, recommendations, and actions taken to the General Assembly on or before December 31 each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0548
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0581 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-4A-01 through 10-4A-03 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM