Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit – Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Madaleno, Ready, Robinson, Salling, Serafini, Smith, Waugh, DeGrange, Edwards, Manno, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding eligibility for a credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax for certain veterans to include a surviving spouse, who has not remarried, of certain veterans; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0165
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Widow or Widower of Veteran
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {789534/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Widow or Widower of Veteran
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {745567/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Credit – Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit – Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Widow or Widower of Veteran
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {789534/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Widow or Widower of Veteran
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {745567/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Credit – Surviving Spouse of Veteran
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit – Surviving Spouse of Veteran
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM