Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers and County Public Libraries - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators King, Miller, Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Getty, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, and Robey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the per capita dollar amount beginning in fiscal year 2016 that is required to be provided to each regional resource center and county public library system participating in the State's library program.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1063
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {649634/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {649634/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 37
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-205, 23-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM