Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Hester, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Patterson, Peters, Rosapepe, Waldstreicher, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each authorized prescriber who receives a financial gratuity or incentive from a pharmaceutical distributor or manufacturer to file a certain disclosure form with the Maryland Health Care Commission within 30 days of the receipt of the financial gratuity or incentive: authorizing the Commission to impose a fine of up to $1,000 per violation; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0696
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Authorized Prescribers - Reporting of Financial Gratuities or Incentives
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM