Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Public Service Commission to conduct certain hearings relating to certain rate increases virtually; authorizing the Commission to conduct certain public hearings relating to certain certificates of public convenience and necessity virtually in a certain manner; requiring the Commission to provide information on the virtual hearings prominently on the Commission's website; etc.;
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0556
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2021
Legislative Date
1/24/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
Senate 1/24/2021 1/24/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Economic Matters 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page