Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Bridge to Excellence - State Hold-Harmless Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Getty, Brinkley, Edwards, Hershey, and Kittleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a grant to specified county boards of education in specified fiscal years if total direct education aid in the current fiscal year is less than in the prior fiscal year; and declaring it is the intent of the General Assembly that no county board of education receive less State direct education aid in the current fiscal year than in the prior fiscal year until after the completion of a specified study.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM