Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Kagan, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to issue an order authorizing or directing a law enforcement officer to use a cell site simulator after making a certain determination; requiring a law enforcement agency authorized to use a cell site simulator to take certain actions; limiting to 30 days or less the time period during which a cell site simulator may be used or location information may be obtained under the authority of a certain order; requiring cell site simulator use by law enforcement to begin 10 days after issuance of an order; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0314
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0878 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928873/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {928873/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM