Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Benson, Conway, Currie, Gladden, Kelley, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Raskin, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Department of Assessments and Taxation from imposing a fee for the filing of specified documents by corporations or business entities with 10 or fewer employees; requiring specified corporations to compute Maryland taxable income using a specified combined reporting method; requiring, subject to specified regulations, specified groups of corporations to file a combined income tax return reflecting the aggregate income tax liability of all the members of the group; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0812
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0179 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402.1, 10-402.2, 10-811 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM