Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Educational Programs for Adult Learners
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Colburn, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Shank, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Establishment of Educational Programs for Adult Learners; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; establishing the duties of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report, on or before December 1, 2013, to the Governor, the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee, and the House Committee on Ways and Means; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314330/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {314330/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 46
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM