Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Astle, Cassilly, Currie, DeGrange, Guzzone, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Montgomery, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Waugh, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Hershey, Kelley, Middleton, Reilly, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring licensed funeral establishments or holders of permits for the business of operating a crematory in the possession of unclaimed cremated human remains for 90 days or more to provide identifying information to specified veterans service organizations to determine if the unclaimed cremains are those of a veteran or an eligible dependent; requiring specified veterans service organizations to make a specified notification of specified information within 45 days of receipt of the identifying information of the unclaimed cremains; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {547473/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {346087/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {547473/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 45
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {346087/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-803 )
(   7-101, 7-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM