Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Special Requirements for Elderly, Chronically Ill, and Terminally Ill Inmates
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kelley, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each State and local correctional facility to accommodate the special needs of elderly, chronically ill, and terminally ill inmates and detainees in accordance with standards, guidelines, and recommendations issued or endorsed by the National Institute of Corrections; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to designate certain sites for the housing of inmates who are over the age of 64, chronically ill, or terminally ill; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0906
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM