Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators King, Waugh, Currie, Ferguson, Madaleno, Serafini, and Middleton
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing additional funds to St. Mary's College of Maryland if specified funding is provided for specified wage increases for specified State employees in specified fiscal years; providing additional funds to the College to pay for the increase in State-supported health insurance costs of the College; stating the legislative intent regarding specified appropriations for the purpose of moderating undergraduate tuition cost increases at the College; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0556
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {899339/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Funding
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {899339/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Funding
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 69
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM